Michael Deon Little II v. Upland Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Michael Deon Little, II
Defendant: Attorney Joy H., Dafiney Lashay Robinson, Upland Police Department, Judge Yabuno and West Valley Detention Center Officer and Staff Members
Case Number: 5:2019cv01055
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero, ORDERING Letter submitted by Plaintiff Michael Deon Little, II received on 7/10/19 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: No letters to the judge. (sbou)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (In Chambers): Order Dismissing Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8 (ECF No. #1 ) by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. the Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. No later than August 7, 2019, Plaintiff must either: (1) file a First Amended Complaint ("FAC") that complies with Rule 8; or (2) advise the Court that Plaintiff does not intend to file a FAC. (See document for details.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (sbou)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING SCREENING IN PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Until the Complaint has been screened and the Court has ordered that service of process may occur, Plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon Defendants. (See document for further details.) (sbou)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: granting #5 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. (sbou)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Michael Deon Little, II. (et)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Regarding Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Payment of Filing Fee #2 by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days after this order, Plaintiff submit to the Court the filing fee of $400 or file a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis with the required supporting documentation. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that the Complaint be dismissed. C.D. Cal. L.R. 41-1. (Attachments: #1 CV60 IFP request) (et)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (car)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Joy H., Dafiney Lashay Robinson, Upland Police Department, West Valley Detention Center Officer and Staff Members, Yabuno pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero, filed by plaintiff Michael Deon Little, II. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Deon Little II v. Upland Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Joy H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dafiney Lashay Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Yabuno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley Detention Center Officer and Staff Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Deon Little, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?