FFF ENTERPRISES INC. v. CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC PC et al
Plaintiff: FFF ENTERPRISES INC.
Defendant: CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC LLC, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, CAMPUS EYE GROUP LLC and CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC PC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01072
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by PLAINTIFF FFF ENTERPRISES INC.. (Aires, Timothy)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than August 2, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF FFF ENTERPRISES INC., re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 BY MAIL ON BEHALF OF CAMPUS EYE GROUP LLC served on 06/12/2019. (Aires, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF FFF ENTERPRISES INC., re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 BY MAIL ON BEHALF OF CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC LLC served on 06/12/2019. (Aires, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF FFF ENTERPRISES INC., re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 BY MAIL ON BEHALF OF CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC PC served on 06/12/2019. (Aires, Timothy)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC LLC, CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC PC, CAMPUS EYE GROUP LLC. (jtil)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Exhibit (non-trial) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by PLAINTIFF FFF ENTERPRISES INC.. (Aires, Timothy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff FFF ENTERPRISES INC.. as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (Aires, Timothy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff FFF ENTERPRISES INC.. (Aires, Timothy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23901367 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF FFF ENTERPRISES INC.. (Attorney Timothy C Aires added to party FFF ENTERPRISES INC.(pty:pla))(Aires, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FFF ENTERPRISES INC. v. CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPUS EYE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPUS EYE GROUP ASC PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FFF ENTERPRISES INC.
Represented By: Timothy C Aires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?