Salvador Ortiz v. BMW of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Salvador Ortiz
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01098
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (Discovery cut-off 2/24/2020. Motions due by 3/2/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 9, 2020. (mrgo)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for July 29, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2019. Discovery cut-off 2/24/2020. Exhibit List due by 3/20/2020. Witness List due by 3/20/2020. Motions due by 3/2/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 4/3/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2020. Status Report due by 3/20/2020. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/9/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Salvador Ortiz.. (Romano, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Percy Anderson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01098 PA (KKx). (jtil)
June 13, 2019 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Salvador Ortiz in Riverside Superior Court on 5/9/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Jury Demand #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 served on June 13, 2019. (Mashburn, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Mashburn, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Mashburn, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Mashburn, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number MCC1900534 Receipt No: 0973-23918426 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael C. Mashburn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Attorney Michael Charles Mashburn added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Mashburn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvador Ortiz v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Ortiz
Represented By: Timothy Michael Whelan
Represented By: Mark P Romano
Represented By: Aliaksandra Valitskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Michael Charles Mashburn
Represented By: Daniel R Villegas
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?