Misael Romero v. Robert Douglas Kilgore et al
Plaintiff: Misael Romero
Defendant: Meys Insurance Services, Inc., Maria Dolores Kilgore, Robert Douglas Kilgore and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01100
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maria Dolores Kilgore answer now due 8/9/2019; Robert Douglas Kilgore answer now due 8/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Maria Dolores Kilgore; Robert Douglas Kilgore.(Attorney Bryan Owens Sahagun added to party Maria Dolores Kilgore(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Owens Sahagun added to party Robert Douglas Kilgore(pty:dft))(Sahagun, Bryan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Misael Romero, upon Defendant Robert Douglas Kilgore served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Douglas Kilgore by maria Kilgore in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Misael Romero, upon Defendant Meys Insurance Services, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Meys Insurance Services, Inc., by William Houle, Incharge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Misael Romero, upon Defendant Maria Dolores Kilgore served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Dolores Kilgore in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Maria Dolores Kilgore, Robert Douglas Kilgore, Meys Insurance Services, Inc. (et)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Misael Romero. (Cornell, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Misael Romero, (Cornell, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Misael Romero. (Cornell, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23919291 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Misael Romero. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Misael Romero(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misael Romero v. Robert Douglas Kilgore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meys Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Dolores Kilgore
Represented By: Bryan Owens Sahagun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Douglas Kilgore
Represented By: Bryan Owens Sahagun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misael Romero
Represented By: Ross Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?