Aldrian Coley v. Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ALDRIAN COLEY
Defendant: Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC and Does 1 to 100
Case Number: 5:2019cv01105
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS #9 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The first, second, and third causes of action are DISMISSED WITH FOURTEEN DAYS' LEAVE TO AMEND. The fourth cause of action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (iv)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Balch, Shayna)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Aldrian Coley. Re: Notice (Other) #11 (Paulson, Randall)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Opposition filed by Plaintiff Aldrian Coley. (Paulson, Randall)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Balch, Shayna)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Balch, Shayna)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER #7 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The deadline for defendants Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC and Swift Transportation Services, LLC to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended up to and including Wednesday, June 26, 2019. (iv)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Swift Transportation Services, LLC answer now due 6/26/2019; Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC answer now due 6/26/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Swift Transportation Services, LLC; Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balch, Shayna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, identifying Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC and Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Warden, Jenna)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-1105 CJC (SPx). (car)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, filed by plaintiff Aldrian Coley. Filed in State Court on 7/19/18 Submitted with Exhibit A to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Balch, Shayna)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1818819 Receipt No: 0973-23924696 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons) (Attorney Shayna Helene Balch added to party Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shayna Helene Balch added to party Swift Transportation Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Balch, Shayna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldrian Coley v. Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Shayna Helene Balch
Represented By: Jenna M Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Shayna Helene Balch
Represented By: Jenna M Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALDRIAN COLEY
Represented By: Randall J Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?