David M. Brandt v. Robert Wilke et al
Plaintiff: David M. Brandt
Defendant: Loma Linda VA Medical Center and Robert Wilke
Case Number: 5:2019cv01148
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting #7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iv)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff David M. Brandt, re APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents #7 served on 7/31/2019. (iv)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff David M. Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (iv)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (lom)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff David M. Brandt. (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Loma Linda VA Medical Center, Robert Wilke. (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Loma Linda VA Medical Center, Robert Wilke.Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym,(Filing fee $ 400 paid), Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff David M. Brandt. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David M. Brandt v. Robert Wilke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loma Linda VA Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?