Jean Perryman v. Employment Development Department State of California
Plaintiff: Jean Perryman
Defendant: Employment Development Department State of California
Case Number: 5:2019cv01152
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jaclyn Dyan Grossman re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #12 filed by Defendant Employment Development Department State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grossman, Jaclyn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendant Employment Development Department State of California.(Attorney Jaclyn Dyan Grossman added to party Employment Development Department State of California (pty:dft))(Grossman, Jaclyn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Employment Development Department State of California by serving State of California by serving Shanae Buffington, Attorney on 7/10/2019 by prpcess server. (shb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jean Perryman, upon Defendant Employment Development Department State of California served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shanae Buffington, Attorney in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service/ by mail acknowledgment of of receipt of service, not returned. Original Summons NOT returned. (shb)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Document Certification and Notice of Interested Parties due to clerical error. The docket clerk failed to attach the entire image of the new action. (ghap)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Employment Development Department State of California. (hr)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jean Perryman. (ghap)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
June 21, 2019 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jean Perryman. (ghap) Modified on 6/24/2019 (ghap).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Jean Perryman. (ghap) Modified on 6/24/2019 (ghap).
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Employment Development Department State of California.Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Jean Perryman. (Attachments: #1 CV-71, #2 Summons) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean Perryman v. Employment Development Department State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employment Development Department State of California
Represented By: Jaclyn Dyan Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?