Richard Michael Singleton v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Richard Michael Singleton
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01159
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-1159 KK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Richard Michael Singleton. (Kuntz, William)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Jennifer A Kenney added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Kenney, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Michael Singleton, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 7/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. DeLaRosa, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carly Sase, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to B. Salfong, Title Unknown, on behalf of General Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint documents. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (dts)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Andrew Saul. (dts)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dts)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Richard Michael Singleton. (Kuntz, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Richard Michael Singleton, identifying Unitied States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Richard Michael Singleton. (Kuntz, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Richard Michael Singleton. (Kuntz, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Richard Michael Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Richard Michael Singleton(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Michael Singleton v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jennifer A Kenney
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Michael Singleton
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?