Jones-Covey Group, Inc. v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jones-Covey Group, Inc.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2019cv01228
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jones-Covey Group, Inc., upon Defendant United States of America served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. De La Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E. Sosa. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Mudd, Joseph)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant United States of America. (esa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jones-Covey Group, Inc.. (Mudd, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Jones-Covey Group, Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Mudd, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jones-Covey Group, Inc., identifying Jones-Covey Group, Inc.. (Mudd, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jones-Covey Group, Inc.. (Mudd, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24019845 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jones-Covey Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Joseph E Mudd added to party Jones-Covey Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mudd, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones-Covey Group, Inc. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones-Covey Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?