Karrene Phillips et al v. County of Riverside, et al
Plaintiff: Karrene Phillips, Clarence Woods and Wayne Shepperd
Defendant: County of Riverside, DOES 1-10 Inclusive and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01231
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING WRITTEN CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION filed by plaintiffs Karrene Phillips, Wayne Shepperd, Clarence Woods. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue - Stephanie Funston)(Papaefthimiou, Alexander)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Approving Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #18 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall have until September 27, 2019 to respond to the Complaint in this action. (twdb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant County of Riverside. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend time to respond to Complaint)(Palagi, Jennifer)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF FILING WRITTEN CONSENTS TO JOIN ACTION filed by plaintiffs Karrene Phillips, Wayne Shepperd, Clarence Woods. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue - Susan Maday, #2 Consent to Sue - Eliza Ramirez-Neally)(Papaefthimiou, Alexander)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING WRITTEN CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION [29 USC 216(b)] filed by plaintiffs Karrene Phillips, Wayne Shepperd, Clarence Woods. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Deborah Biddle to Join Action)(Papaefthimiou, Alexander)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING WRITTEN CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION [29 USC 216(b)] filed by plaintiffs Karrene Phillips, Wayne Shepperd, Clarence Woods. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Amber Corcuera to Join Action)(Papaefthimiou, Alexander)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer K Palagi counsel for Defendant County of Riverside. Adding Jennifer K. Palagi as counsel of record for Defendant County of Riverside for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Riverside. (Attorney Jennifer K Palagi added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft))(Palagi, Jennifer)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian P Walter counsel for Defendant County of Riverside. Adding Brian P. Walter as counsel of record for Defendant County of Riverside for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of Riverside. (Attorney Brian P Walter added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft))(Walter, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to County of Riverside answer now due 8/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant County of Riverside.(Arce, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant County of Riverside, identifying County of Riverside. (Attorney Elizabeth Tom Arce added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft))(Arce, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING WRITTEN CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION [29 USC 216(b)] filed by plaintiffs Karrene Phillips, Wayne Shepperd, Clarence Woods. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Amy Anderson to Join Action)(Papaefthimiou, Alexander)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karrene Phillips, Clarence Woods, Wayne Shepperd, upon Defendant County of Riverside served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sue Maxwell, Clerk of the Board in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Papaefthimiou, Alexander)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant County of Riverside. (esa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Papaefthimiou, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Karrene Phillips, Wayne Shepperd, Clarence Woods. (Papaefthimiou, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Karrene Phillips, Wayne Shepperd, Clarence Woods. (Papaefthimiou, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24023903 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Karrene Phillips, Clarence Woods, Wayne Shepperd. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue, #3 Consent to Sue) (Attorney Alexander E Papaefthimiou added to party Karrene Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Alexander E Papaefthimiou added to party Wayne Shepperd(pty:pla), Attorney Alexander E Papaefthimiou added to party Clarence Woods(pty:pla))(Papaefthimiou, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karrene Phillips et al v. County of Riverside, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karrene Phillips
Represented By: Alexander E Papaefthimiou
Represented By: Megan A Richmond
Represented By: C Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Woods
Represented By: Alexander E Papaefthimiou
Represented By: Megan A Richmond
Represented By: C Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Shepperd
Represented By: Alexander E Papaefthimiou
Represented By: Megan A Richmond
Represented By: C Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Riverside
Represented By: Jennifer K Palagi
Represented By: Elizabeth Tom Arce
Represented By: Brian P Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?