Travin Baker v. Propak Logistics, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Travin Baker
Defendant: Propak Logistics, Inc. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01241
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 OPPOSITION to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendant's Oppposition to Plaintiff's re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff Travin Baker. (Aziz, Cinela)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff Travin Baker. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Aziz, Cinela)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Travin Baker.. (Aziz, Cinela)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc.. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Corrected) Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Remand (Including Table of Contents and Table of Authorities)(Chen, Peiyi)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #12 (IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION DKT # 13 filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Chen, Peiyi)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Turner, #2 Declaration of Penny Chen with Exh A)(Chen, Peiyi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Travin Baker. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cinela AzizIn Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Cinela Aziz added to party Travin Baker(pty:pla)) (Aziz, Cinela)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc.. (Chen, Peiyi)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa)
July 3, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Propak Logistics, Inc. (Filed in state court 7/2/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 5)(esa)
July 3, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Propak Logistics, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Travin Baker. (Filed in state court 4/30/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 4) (esa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 served on July 3, 2019. (Chen, Peiyi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc. (Chen, Peiyi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc.. (Chen, Peiyi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc., identifying Propak Logistics, Inc.. (Chen, Peiyi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc.. (Chen, Peiyi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1912809 Receipt No: 0973-24030512 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Propak Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of James Hart In Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit A - G to James Hart's Declaration In Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, #3 Declaration Of William Turner In Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, #4 (State) Complaint, #5 (State) Answer) (Attorney Peiyi Chen added to party Propak Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chen, Peiyi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travin Baker v. Propak Logistics, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travin Baker
Represented By: Cinela Aziz
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propak Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Peiyi Chen
Represented By: James E Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?