Diana L Stowell v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Diana L Stowell
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01255
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Cho, Young)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Diana L Stowell, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 7/25/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cho, Young)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (kh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (kh)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (kh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Diana L Stowell, (Cho, Young)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Diana L Stowell. (Cho, Young)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Diana L Stowell. (Cho, Young)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Diana L Stowell. (Cho, Young)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Diana L Stowell. (Attorney Young Chul Cho added to party Diana L Stowell(pty:pla))(Cho, Young)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diana L Stowell v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana L Stowell
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?