Maria Medrano v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Maria Medrano
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01267
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-1267 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano. (Kalagian, Marc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kalagian, Marc)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 60 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #11 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (jdo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #11 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (sbou)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano. (Kalagian, Marc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Andrew M. Saul amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano(Kalagian, Marc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sbou)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano. (Kalagian, Marc)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (jdo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The defendant on the summons does not match the defendant indicated on the complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano. (Kalagian, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano, (Kalagian, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano. (Kalagian, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano. (Kalagian, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Maria Medrano. (Attorney Marc V Kalagian added to party Maria Medrano(pty:pla))(Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Medrano v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Medrano
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?