In Re: Terry Lee Fleming, Sr.
Plaintiff: Havasu Lakeshore Investments, LLC
Defendant: Terry Lee Fleming, Sr., Terry Lee Fleming, Jr., Havasu Landing LLC, Patricia Wilson-Fleming, Havasu Landing, LLC, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Patricia Lynne Wilson-Fleming, Terry L. Fleming, Jr. and Terry L. Fleming, Sr.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01299
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2019 is continued to 9/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Opposition to Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Plaintiff Havasu Lakeshore Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Eliopulos, Martin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 JOINDER filed by Defendant Terry L. Fleming, Sr, In re Debtor Terry Lee Fleming, Sr. joining in Miscellaneous Document, #6 . (Till, James)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Terry L. Fleming, Jr, Havasu Landing, LLC, identifying Havasu Lakeshore Investments, LLC, Terry L. Fleming, Sr., Terry L. Fleming, Jr., Havasu Landing, LLC, and Patricia Lynne Wilson-Fleming. (Attorney Michael B Reynolds added to party Terry L. Fleming, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B Reynolds added to party Havasu Landing, LLC(pty:dft))(Reynolds, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Opposition to Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Defendants Terry L. Fleming, Jr, Havasu Landing, LLC re: Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Attachments: #1 RFJN, Part 1, #2 RFJN, Part 2, #3 RFJN, Part 3, #4 RFJN, Part 4, #5 RFJN, Part 5, #6 RFJN, Part 6, #7 RFJN, Part 7, #8 Proof of Service)(Reynolds, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 5 Civil Cover Sheet and No. 6 Certification as to Interested Parties should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF HEARING on Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw the Reference by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 is set for hearing. Hearing regarding Motion to Withdraw Reference (Complaint) set for 8/12/2019 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 to District Judge James V. Selna. Proposed order forwarded to District Judge. (lh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding No. 6:17-ap-01273-MW to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Case No. 6:17-bk-19513-MW Receipt No: 0973-24087912 - Fee: $181, filed by Plaintiff Havasu Lakeshore Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Frederick Reich, #4 Declaration of Martin Eliopulos, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #7 Proof of Service - Acknowledgment of Service, #8 Notice of Lodgment, #9 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Lodgment, #10 Exhibit 2 to the Notice of Lodgment, #11 Exhibit 3 to the Notice of Lodgment, #12 Exhibit 4 to the Notice of Lodgment, #13 Exhibit 5 to the Notice of Lodgment, #14 Exhibit 6 to the Notice of Lodgment, #15 Exhibit 7 to the Notice of Lodgment, #16 Proof of Service) (Attorney Martin A Eliopulos added to party Havasu Lakeshore Investments, LLC(pty:pla))(Eliopulos, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Terry Lee Fleming, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Lee Fleming, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Lee Fleming, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Havasu Landing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Wilson-Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Havasu Landing, LLC
Represented By: Michael B Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lynne Wilson-Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Fleming, Jr.
Represented By: Michael B Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Fleming, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Havasu Lakeshore Investments, LLC
Represented By: Martin A Eliopulos
Represented By: Frederick M Reich
Represented By: Grant G Teeple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?