Alejandro Galvan et al v. United Pipe and Steel Corp. et al
Plaintiff: ALEJANDRO GALVAN, an Individual,, GRACIELA SOTO, an Individual, JUAN GALVAN, an Individual,, Alejandro Galvan, Juan Galvan and Graciela Soto
Defendant: OSCAR GUZMAN, an Individual, and, DOES 1-25, inclusive, UNITED PIPE AND STEEL CORP., a Corporation,, United Pipe and Steel Corp. and Oscar Guzman
Case Number: 5:2019cv01300
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant United Pipe and Steel Corp..(Stahl, Remick)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Oscar Guzman filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Galvan, Graciela Soto, Juan Galvan.(Epsha, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United Pipe and Steel Corp. answer now due 8/21/2019, re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant United Pipe and Steel Corp..(Stahl, Remick)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01300 VAP (SPx). (lh)
July 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Oscar Guzman, United Pipe and Steel Corp., Does 1-25 amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiffs Alejandro Galvan, Graciela Soto, Juan Galvan. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/06/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2)(lh)
July 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants United Pipe and Steel Corp., Does 1-25. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Alejandro Galvan, Graciela Soto, Juan Galvan. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/26/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, 1-2 #1 ) (lh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant UNITED PIPE AND STEEL CORP., a Corporation,. (Hood, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UNITED PIPE AND STEEL CORP., a Corporation,, (Hood, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant UNITED PIPE AND STEEL CORP., a Corporation, (Hood, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant UNITED PIPE AND STEEL CORP., a Corporation,. (Hood, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1912723 Receipt No: 0973-24088114 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant UNITED PIPE AND STEEL CORP., a Corporation,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole Coup, #2 Declaration of Nicole M. Shaffer) (Attorney Michael A Hood added to party UNITED PIPE AND STEEL CORP., a Corporation, (pty:dft))(Hood, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alejandro Galvan et al v. United Pipe and Steel Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSCAR GUZMAN, an Individual, and
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED PIPE AND STEEL CORP., a Corporation,
Represented By: Michael A Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Pipe and Steel Corp.
Represented By: Nicole Shaffer
Represented By: Michael A Hood
Represented By: Remick M Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEJANDRO GALVAN, an Individual,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACIELA SOTO, an Individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN GALVAN, an Individual,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Galvan
Represented By: Christopher Paul Epsha
Represented By: Shawn Sasooness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Galvan
Represented By: Christopher Paul Epsha
Represented By: Shawn Sasooness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Soto
Represented By: Christopher Paul Epsha
Represented By: Shawn Sasooness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?