George Gutenberg v. Fraser Almeida et al
Plaintiff: George Gutenberg
Defendant: Fraser Almeida d/b/a Luxury Home Photography, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive and Fraser Almeida
Case Number: 5:2019cv01309
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTES: IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a motion for default judgment or, other appropriate dispositive motion on or before October 4, 2019. Failure to file said dispositive motion by October 4, 2019, will result in dismissal without further notice by the Court. (yl)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to FRASER ALMEIDA d/b/a LUXURY HOME PHOTOGRAPHY (yl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Fraser Almeida filed by Plaintiff George Gutenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ryan E. Carreon, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default) (Carreon, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 9/3/2019.) (mrgo)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff George Gutenberg, upon Defendant Fraser Almeida served on 8/3/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Fraser Almeida in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carreon, Ryan)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-01309 PA(KKx). (rn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:19-cv-01309 CAS(KKx). (rn)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff George Gutenberg re: Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #5 . (Higbee, Mathew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff George Gutenberg, identifying George Gutenberg. (Higbee, Mathew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Fraser Almeida. (lh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mathew K Higbee counsel for Plaintiff George Gutenberg. Filed by Plaintiff George Gutenberg. (Higbee, Mathew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by George Gutenberg. (Higbee, Mathew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff George Gutenberg. (Higbee, Mathew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24097866 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff George Gutenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party George Gutenberg(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Gutenberg v. Fraser Almeida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser Almeida d/b/a Luxury Home Photography
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser Almeida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gutenberg
Represented By: Mathew K Higbee
Represented By: Ryan E Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?