Marggieh Dicarlo v. MoneyLion, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marggieh Dicarlo
Defendant: ML Plus LLC, ML Wealth LLC, Moneylion of California LLC, Moneylion, Inc., MoneyLion of California, LLC, ML Wealth, LLC and ML Plus, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01374
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendants MoneyLion of California, LLC, MoneyLion, Inc..(Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party MoneyLion of California, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party MoneyLion, Inc. (pty:dft))(Ramsey, Jay)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marggieh Dicarlo, upon Defendant ML Wealth, LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patti Gatto, National Registered Agents, Inc. (Agent for Service of Process) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tang, Kolin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marggieh Dicarlo, upon Defendant ML Plus, LLC served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patti Gatto, National Registered Agents, Inc. (Agent for Service of Process) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tang, Kolin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marggieh Dicarlo, upon Defendant MoneyLion of California, LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte, National Registered Agents, Inc. (Agent for Service of Process) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tang, Kolin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marggieh Dicarlo, upon Defendant MoneyLion, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte, National Registered Agents, Inc. (Agent for Service of Process) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tang, Kolin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants ML Plus, LLC, ML Wealth, LLC. (bm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marggieh Dicarlo. (Tang, Kolin)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants ML Plus, LLC, ML Wealth, LLC, MoneyLion of California, LLC, MoneyLion, Inc. (ghap)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marggieh Dicarlo, (Tang, Kolin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marggieh Dicarlo. (Tang, Kolin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marggieh Dicarlo. (Tang, Kolin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24151408 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Marggieh Dicarlo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Complaint, #8 Exhibit H to Complaint) (Attorney Kolin Tang added to party Marggieh Dicarlo(pty:pla))(Tang, Kolin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marggieh Dicarlo v. MoneyLion, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ML Plus LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ML Wealth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moneylion of California LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moneylion, Inc.
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MoneyLion of California, LLC
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ML Wealth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ML Plus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marggieh Dicarlo
Represented By: Kolin Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?