Paul Hyde v. Aerotek, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Hyde
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive, Smithfield Foods, Inc. and Aerotek, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01489
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CITIZENSHIP by Judge Percy Anderson. On September 19, 2019, the Court issued an Oder to Show Cause regarding plaintiff Paul Hyde's citizenship. (Docket No. #15 .) Before the Court is Plaintiff's declaration of citizenship, filed on September 27, 2019. (Docket No. #16 .) The Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause. (lom)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Declaration of Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Paul Hyde. (Choi, Nehemiah)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDINGCITIZENSHIP by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2019.) (mrgo)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (Discovery cut-off 3/23/2020. Motions due by 3/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 6/2/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for September 23, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. (Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2019. Discovery cut-off 3/23/2020. Exhibit List due by 4/17/2020. Witness List due by 4/17/2020. Motions due by 3/30/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 5/1/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2020. Status Report due by 4/17/2020. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/6/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 6/2/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than April 06, 2020. (mrgo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 to 7 days, filed by Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc... (Quigley, D)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on August 13, 2019. (Bobb, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Percy Anderson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01489-PA (SHKx). (et)
August 9, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Aerotek, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/25/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 .(et)
August 9, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
August 9, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aerotek, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Smithfield Foods, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Paul Hyde. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/21/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A AS ATTACHMENT TO NO. 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Bobb, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc., (Bobb, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Bobb, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number RIC 1903456 Receipt No: 0973-24239538 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Declaration of Buck Acosta in Support of Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc.'s Notice of Removal) (Attorney Matthew Ian Bobb added to party Smithfield Foods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bobb, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Hyde v. Aerotek, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hyde
Represented By: Nehemiah Choi
Represented By: Eliot Joel Rushovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Ian Bobb
Represented By: Andrea R Calem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerotek, Inc.
Represented By: Craig J O'Loughlin
Represented By: Marian M Zapata-Rossa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?