Bridget Martinsen v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Bridget Martinsen
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01497
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bridget Martinsen, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/20/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Shvarts, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (dts)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Andrew M. Saul. (dts)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dts)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bridget Martinsen, (Shvarts, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Bridget Martinsen. (Shvarts, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Bridget Martinsen. (Shvarts, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bridget Martinsen. (Shvarts, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Bridget Martinsen. (Attorney Michelle J Shvarts added to party Bridget Martinsen(pty:bkmov))(Shvarts, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridget Martinsen v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Martinsen
Represented By: Michelle J Shvarts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?