Raul Morales et al v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Raul Morales, Robinson Bertrand and Rosalie Quinones
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01611
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
3 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Cristina M Squiers APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor North America, Inc., designating Christopher Chorba as local counsel. (bm)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew LeGrand APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor North America, Inc., designating Christopher Chorba as local counsel. (bm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cristina M. Squiers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24526034) #29 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew LeGrand to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24525569) #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cristina M. Squiers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24526034) filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chorba, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew LeGrand to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24525569) filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chorba, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lori C Arakaki counsel for Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Adding Lori Arakaki as counsel of record for Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attorney Lori C Arakaki added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Lori C Arakaki added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Arakaki, Lori)
September 30, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Norman Harris counsel for Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Adding Alexander N. Harris as counsel of record for Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. and Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. and Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attorney Alexander Norman Harris added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Norman Harris added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Harris, Alexander)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Chorba counsel for Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Adding Christopher Chorba as counsel of record for Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher Chorba added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Chorba added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chorba, Christopher)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Amey J Park APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Raul Morales, Bertrand Robinson, and Rosalie Quinones, individually and on behalf of a class of similarly situated individuals, designating Mark A Ozzello as local counsel. (bm)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Russell D Paul APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Raul Morales, Bertrand Robinson, and Rosalie Quinones, individually and on behalf of a class of similarly situated individuals, designating Mark A Ozzello as local counsel. (bm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Standing Order of Honorable Virginia Phillips filed by Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones. (Ozzello, Mark)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00750 VAP(ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-01611 VAP(ADSx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones, Robinson Bertrand. upon Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019; Toyota Motor North America, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Amir Nassihi. (Ozzello, Mark)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amey J. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24375589) filed by Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Ozzello, Mark)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Russell D. Paul to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24367314) filed by Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice of Russell Paul) (Ozzello, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Amey J. Park on behalf of Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Additional time is needed to obtain original certificate of good standing. Once obtained, the application will be promptly submitted to the Court. (lt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Russell D. Paul on behalf of Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Additional time is needed to obtain original certificate of good standing. Once obtained, the application will be promptly submitted to the Court. (lt)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Toyota Motor Corporation. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Amey J Park. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Russell D Paul. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:19-cv-1611 CAS (SP). (ghap)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones, (Ozzello, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones. (Ozzello, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones. (Ozzello, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones. (Ozzello, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Robinson Bertrand, Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones. (Ozzello, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24311589 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Raul Morales, Rosalie Quinones, Robinson Bertrand. (Attorney Mark A Ozzello added to party Robinson Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Ozzello added to party Raul Morales(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Ozzello added to party Rosalie Quinones(pty:pla))(Ozzello, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raul Morales et al v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Morales
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R Padgett
Represented By: Mark A Ozzello
Represented By: Russell D Paul
Represented By: Amey J Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinson Bertrand
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R Padgett
Represented By: Mark A Ozzello
Represented By: Russell D Paul
Represented By: Amey J Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Quinones
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R Padgett
Represented By: Mark A Ozzello
Represented By: Russell D Paul
Represented By: Amey J Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Cristina M Squires
Represented By: Christopher Chorba
Represented By: Alexander Norman Harris
Represented By: Andrew P LeGrand
Represented By: Lori C Arakaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Cristina M Squires
Represented By: Christopher Chorba
Represented By: Alexander Norman Harris
Represented By: Andrew P LeGrand
Represented By: Lori C Arakaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?