Ramon Carter v. Tooley Family LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Carter
Defendant: Does 1-10, Tequila Hoppers Bar and Grill Inc. and Tooley Family LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01729
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by Plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabock, Amanda)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Ramon Carter (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Ramon Carter(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ramon Carter, upon Defendant Tequila Hoppers Bar and Grill Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Traci(Doe)-Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Tequila Hoppers Bar and Grill Inc., Tooley Family LLC. (lh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter, (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24415037 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Ramon Carter(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramon Carter v. Tooley Family LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tequila Hoppers Bar and Grill Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tooley Family LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Carter
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?