Sundesa, LLC v. Zoyer, LLC
Plaintiff: Sundesa, LLC
Defendant: Zoyer, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01746
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: The Court is in receipt of the NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Sundesa, LLC (ECF #19). Dismissal is with prejudice. Accordingly, the Court Orders that this matter shall be dismissed pursuant ot the Voluntary Dismissal. The Court vacates all pending hearings. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
November 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Williams, David)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC, upon Defendant Zoyer, LLC served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melanie S. - Process Specialist at Legalzoom.com in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Williams, David)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trevor L. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC and designating David J. Williams as local counsel #12 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Larry R. Laycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC and designating David J. Williams as local counsel #11 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 5:19-cv-01746 SJO (SHKx). (mrgo)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-01746 DMG (SHKx). (esa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trevor L. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24474578) filed by Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Larry R. Laycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24474550) filed by Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Larry R Laycock. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Trevor L Clark. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Zoyer, LLC. (car)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Sundesa, LLC. (Williams, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC, (Williams, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC. (Williams, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC. (Williams, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24428162 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sundesa, LLC. (Attorney David John Williams added to party Sundesa, LLC(pty:pla))(Williams, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundesa, LLC v. Zoyer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundesa, LLC
Represented By: David John Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoyer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?