Dale Randolph Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dale Randolph Nelson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv01785
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, re Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final, #10 served on November 1, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Benavides, Francesco)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Benavides, Francesco)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dale Randolph Nelson, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (sbou) Modified on 10/9/2019 (lmu).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Mandatory chambers copies of e-filed documents shall be delivered to theMagistrate Judge's box located outside the Clerk's Office, 12th Floor, Roybal Federal Building and Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012, within twenty-four hours after e-filing. (See document for details.) (sbou)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (In Chambers): ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (PLAINTIFF PRO PER) upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. (See document for details.) (sbou)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Social Security), #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (sbou)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou) Modified on 9/23/2019 (sbou).
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Dale Randolph Nelson. (car)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dale Randolph Nelson (car)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, filed by Plaintiff Dale Randolph Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #2 Summons) (car).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale Randolph Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Francesco P Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Randolph Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?