Hui Yu v. American General Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hui Yu
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company and Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01788
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 12/23/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American General Life Insurance Company, identifying American International Group, Inc.; SAFG Retirement Services, Inc.; AIG Life Holdings, Inc.; AGC Life Insurance Company. (Frost, Christopher)
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American General Life Insurance Company.(Frost, Christopher)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney David S. Klevatt APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Hui Yu, designating Christopher Pitoun as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney John P. Bjork APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Hui Yu, designating Christopher Pitoun as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph M. Vanek APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Hui Yu, designating Christopher Pitoun as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David S. Klevatt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hui Yu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24631590) filed by Plaintiff Hui Yu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pitoun, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Bjork to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hui Yu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24631507) filed by Plaintiff Hui Yu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pitoun, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph M. Vanek to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hui Yu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24631375) filed by Plaintiff Hui Yu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pitoun, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American General Life Insurance Company answer now due 11/14/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant American General Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Christopher C Frost added to party American General Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Frost, Christopher)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hui Yu, upon Defendant American General Life Insurance Company served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Inc., Registered Agent of Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pitoun, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant American General Life Insurance Company. (mrgo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Hui Yu. (Pitoun, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David S. Klevatt. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Exhibit (non-trial) #5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Document title/cover page is missing. Pursuant to LR 11-3.8, a title page containing the information outlined under this rule is required on the first page of all documents. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Hui Yu. Exhibit A In Support of Complaint and Demand for Jury trial as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (Pitoun, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hui Yu, (Pitoun, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Hui Yu. (Pitoun, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hui Yu. (Pitoun, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24459453 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Hui Yu. (Attorney Christopher Pitoun added to party Hui Yu(pty:pla))(Pitoun, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hui Yu v. American General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hui Yu
Represented By: David S Klevatt
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: John P Bjork
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?