Sean Licea v. DMSD Foods, Inc.
Petitioner: Sean Licea
Respondent: Dmsd Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01793
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred to Central District of California, Eastern Division. Files transferred electronically to: *Central District of California, Eastern Division*.*3470 Twelfth Street**Riverside, CA 92501-3801*. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (aef) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/19/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Change Venue and Stipulation for the Central District of California by Sean Licea. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Zard, Eric) Modified on 9/18/2019 QC email sent re proposed orders should not be filed (aef). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/19/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Licea. DMSD Foods, Inc. served. (Carpenter, Todd) (aef). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/19/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/19/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DMSD Foods, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12847530.), filed by Sean Licea. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01564-DMS-AGS. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Zard, Eric)(als) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sean Licea v. DMSD Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sean Licea
Represented By: Eric David Zard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dmsd Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?