Dylan Sampsel v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Dylan Sampsel
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv01811
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 3:19-CV-07197 filed 10/31/2019. (iv)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Conditional Transfer Order - 159 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2741, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Vince Chhabria. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dylan Sampsel, identifying Plaintiff, Dylan Sampsel; Monsanto Company, Defendant; and Bayer Corp., parent company of Defendant, Monsanto Company.. (Moore, Jennifer)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Complaint filed 9/20/2019 #1 . Per Local Rule 7.1-1, counsel shall immediately file the Certificate of Interested Parties. (gk)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The Civil Cover Sheet should have been filed under a separate event, not as an attachment to the Complaint: Civil Events>Other Filings>Miscellaneous Filings>Civil Cover Sheet CV-71. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Monsanto Company. (jtil)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dylan Sampsel. (Moore, Jennifer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24474079 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dylan Sampsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jennifer A Moore added to party Dylan Sampsel(pty:pla))(Moore, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dylan Sampsel v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Sampsel
Represented By: Jennifer A Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?