Jeffrey Shaw v. BRP US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Shaw
Defendant: BRP US, Inc., Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01830
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued on Amended Complaint #12 as to Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. (yl)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 as to Defendant BRP US, Inc. (yl)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shaw. (Wright, David)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shaw. (Wright, David)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant BRP US, Inc., Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc., Does amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shaw(Wright, David)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-01830 PA (KKx). (esa)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. (lh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BRP US, Inc. (lh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shaw, identifying BRP US, Inc.; Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.; Jeffrey Shaw. (Wright, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Jeffrey Shaw re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 re Venue, pursuant to the California Consumer Legal Remedies Act filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shaw (Wright, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shaw. (Wright, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shaw. (Wright, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shaw. (Wright, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24493873 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shaw. (Attorney David C Wright added to party Jeffrey Shaw(pty:pla))(Wright, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey Shaw v. BRP US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Shaw
Represented By: David C Wright
Represented By: Mark I Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?