Jeff Schneider et al v. City of Upland
Plaintiff: Thomas Barilla, Michael Daignault, Dennis Weaver, Craig Warren, Caralee Skaggs, John Hurt, Christopher Askew, Jason Alexander, Melanie Munns, Matthew Gulserian, Paul Kramer, Thomas Melendrez, Mike Johnson, Andrea Binley, Sean Markey, Brett Dickerson, Ryan Gardy, Nima Homayounieh, Dustin Griffin, Bill Rozinka, Dustin Foulks, Andrei Alexandrescu, Jesse Quinalty, Nicholas Vasquez, Travis Foster, Patricia Cauthen, Joseph Tambe, Christopher Brookhart, Joseph Barna, Nathan Foster, Karl Hegle, Krista Pope, Brad McCaulley, Jonathan Chunchick, Michael Carney, Jeff Schneider, Joseph Armendariz, Leonard Lattimore and Jessica DeVries
Defendant: City of Upland
Case Number: 5:2019cv01834
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE #10 by Judge S. James Otero (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:16-cv-01272 SJO (AFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-01834 SJO (AFMx). Signed by Judge S. James Otero. (mrgo)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Case with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Jason Alexander, Andrei Alexandrescu, Joseph Armendariz, Christopher Askew, Thomas Barilla, Joseph Barna, Andrea Binley, Christopher Brookhart, Michael Carney, Patricia Cauthen, Jonathan Chunchick, Michael Daignault, Jessica DeVries, Brett Dickerson, Nathan Foster, Travis Foster, Dustin Foulks, Ryan Gardy, Dustin Griffin, Matthew Gulserian, Karl Hegle, Nima Homayounieh, John Hurt, Mike Johnson, Paul Kramer, Leonard Lattimore, Sean Markey, Brad McCaulley, Thomas Melendrez, Melanie Munns, Krista Pope, Jesse Quinalty, Bill Rozinka, Jeff Schneider, Caralee Skaggs, Joseph Tambe, Nicholas Vasquez, Craig Warren, Dennis Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Bruce Lindsay, #2 Declaration Of David E. Mastagni, #3 Exhibit A - Fully Executed Settlement Agreement, #4 Proposed Order)(Mastagni, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Special Limited Appearance for the Sole Purpose of Settlement filed by Defendant City of Upland. (Lindsay, Bruce)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant City of Upland. (ghap)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Jeff Schneider, et al. for Consent to be Included as Individual Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Jason Alexander, Andrei Alexandrescu, Joseph Armendariz, Christopher Askew, Thomas Barilla, Joseph Barna, Andrea Binley, Christopher Brookhart, Michael Carney, Patricia Cauthen, Jonathan Chunchick, Michael Daignault, Jessica DeVries, Brett Dickerson, Nathan Foster, Travis Foster, Dustin Foulks, Ryan Gardy, Dustin Griffin, Matthew Gulserian, Karl Hegle, Nima Homayounieh, John Hurt, Mike Johnson, Paul Kramer, Leonard Lattimore, Sean Markey, Brad McCaulley, Thomas Melendrez, Melanie Munns, Krista Pope, Jesse Quinalty, Bill Rozinka, Jeff Schneider, Caralee Skaggs, Joseph Tambe, Nicholas Vasquez, Craig Warren, Dennis Weaver (Mastagni, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jason Alexander, Andrei Alexandrescu, Joseph Armendariz, Christopher Askew, Thomas Barilla, Joseph Barna, Andrea Binley, Christopher Brookhart, Michael Carney, Patricia Cauthen, Jonathan Chunchick, Michael Daignault, Jessica DeVries, Brett Dickerson, Nathan Foster, Travis Foster, Dustin Foulks, Ryan Gardy, Dustin Griffin, Matthew Gulserian, Karl Hegle, Nima Homayounieh, John Hurt, Mike Johnson, Paul Kramer, Leonard Lattimore, Sean Markey, Brad McCaulley, Thomas Melendrez, Melanie Munns, Krista Pope, Jesse Quinalty, Bill Rozinka, Jeff Schneider, Caralee Skaggs, Joseph Tambe, Nicholas Vasquez, Craig Warren, Dennis Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Full Case Caption)(Mastagni, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Mastagni, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jason Alexander, Andrei Alexandrescu, Joseph Armendariz, Christopher Askew, Thomas Barilla, Joseph Barna, Andrea Binley, Christopher Brookhart, Michael Carney, Patricia Cauthen, Jonathan Chunchick, Michael Daignault, Jessica DeVries, Brett Dickerson, Nathan Foster, Travis Foster, Dustin Foulks, Ryan Gardy, Dustin Griffin, Matthew Gulserian, Karl Hegle, Nima Homayounieh, John Hurt, Mike Johnson, Paul Kramer, Leonard Lattimore, Sean Markey, Brad McCaulley, Thomas Melendrez, Melanie Munns, Krista Pope, Jesse Quinalty, Bill Rozinka, Jeff Schneider, Caralee Skaggs, Joseph Tambe, Nicholas Vasquez, Craig Warren, Dennis Weaver. (Mastagni, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24495604 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Jesse Quinalty, Krista Pope, Matthew Gulserian, Joseph Barna, Paul Kramer, Travis Foster, Jason Alexander, Jeff Schneider, Dustin Foulks, Thomas Melendrez, Nathan Foster, Leonard Lattimore, Mike Johnson, Sean Markey, Dustin Griffin, Jessica DeVries, John Hurt, Michael Carney, Melanie Munns, Caralee Skaggs, Patricia Cauthen, Karl Hegle, Michael Daignault, Nima Homayounieh, Brad McCaulley, Thomas Barilla, Dennis Weaver, Joseph Tambe, Andrei Alexandrescu, Christopher Brookhart, Jonathan Chunchick, Brett Dickerson, Craig Warren, Andrea Binley, Joseph Armendariz, Bill Rozinka, Nicholas Vasquez, Ryan Gardy, Christopher Askew. (Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jason Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Andrei Alexandrescu(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Joseph Armendariz(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Christopher Askew(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Thomas Barilla(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Joseph Barna(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Andrea Binley(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Christopher Brookhart(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Michael Carney(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Patricia Cauthen(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jonathan Chunchick(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Michael Daignault(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jessica DeVries(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Brett Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Nathan Foster(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Travis Foster(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Dustin Foulks(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Ryan Gardy(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Dustin Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Matthew Gulserian(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Karl Hegle(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Nima Homayounieh(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party John Hurt(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Mike Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Paul Kramer(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Leonard Lattimore(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Sean Markey(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Brad McCaulley(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Thomas Melendrez(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Melanie Munns(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Krista Pope(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jesse Quinalty(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Bill Rozinka(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jeff Schneider(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Caralee Skaggs(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Joseph Tambe(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Nicholas Vasquez(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Craig Warren(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Dennis Weaver(pty:pla))(Mastagni, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeff Schneider et al v. City of Upland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Barilla
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Daignault
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Weaver
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Warren
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caralee Skaggs
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hurt
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Askew
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Alexander
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Munns
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Gulserian
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Kramer
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Melendrez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Johnson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Binley
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Markey
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Dickerson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Gardy
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nima Homayounieh
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Griffin
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Rozinka
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Foulks
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrei Alexandrescu
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Quinalty
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Vasquez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Foster
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cauthen
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Tambe
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Brookhart
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Barna
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Foster
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Hegle
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Pope
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad McCaulley
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Chunchick
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carney
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Schneider
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Armendariz
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Lattimore
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica DeVries
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Upland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?