Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Kimco Staffing Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission and U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. and Kimco Staffing Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01838
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christin Anne Lawler on behalf of Defendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. (Attorney Christin Anne Lawler added to party Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lawler, Christin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Barbara I Antonucci on behalf of Defendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. (Attorney Barbara I Antonucci added to party Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Antonucci, Barbara)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Steven W. Moore re Notice of Appearance #14 OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Moore, Steven)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc., identifying Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Ryder System, Inc.. (Moore, Steven)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven Woodrow Moore on behalf of Defendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. (Attorney Steven Woodrow Moore added to party Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Moore, Steven)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. upon Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Steven W. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Summons)(Ringer, Andrea)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. upon Kimco Staffing Services, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey R. Thurrell. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Summons)(Ringer, Andrea)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Andrea E. Ringer Lead Trial Cousel Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Ringer, Andrea)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Derek W Li on behalf of Plaintiff U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attorney Derek W Li added to party U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:pla))(Li, Derek)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrea E Ringer on behalf of Plaintiff U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attorney Andrea E Ringer added to party U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:pla))(Ringer, Andrea)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Kimco Staffing Services, Inc., Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ryder) (jtil)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Park, Anna)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Park, Anna)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Park, Anna)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attorney Anna Y Park added to party Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:pla))(Park, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Kimco Staffing Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara I Antonucci
Represented By: Christin Anne Lawler
Represented By: Steven Woodrow Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimco Staffing Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Anna Y Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Anna Y Park
Represented By: Derek W Li
Represented By: Sue J Noh
Represented By: Andrea E Ringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?