Ajith Kumar Kantrapati v. Donna Campagnolo et al
Petitioner: Ajith Kumar Kantrapati
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donna Campagnolo and William Barr
Case Number: 5:2019cv01913
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff-Petitioner Ajith Kumar Kantrapati. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Kumar, Nadadur)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please include the "x" after the Magistrate Judge's initials. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ad)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff-Petitioner Ajith Kumar Kantrapati. (Attachments: #1 Summons Draft, #2 Summons Draft, #3 Summons Draft)(Kumar, Nadadur)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff-Petitioner Ajith Kumar Kantrapati, (Kumar, Nadadur)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff-Petitioner Ajith Kumar Kantrapati, (Kumar, Nadadur)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Ajith Kumar Kantrapati. (Kumar, Nadadur)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, 3 Supplement Notice of Interested Parties are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24565197 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff-Petitioner Ajith Kumar Kantrapati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney Nadadur Sampath Kumar added to party Ajith Kumar Kantrapati(pty:pet))(Kumar, Nadadur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajith Kumar Kantrapati v. Donna Campagnolo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ajith Kumar Kantrapati
Represented By: Nadadur Sampath Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?