Juan Pacheco Lopez v. LKQ Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Juan Pacheco Lopez
Defendant: DOES 1-10 and LKQ Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv01968
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than September 11, 2020. (tg)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel's attention is directed to the Court's Civil Trial Order filed concurrently with this Minute Order. The following dates are set: Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: February 11, 2020; Fact Discovery Cutoff: July 10, 2020; Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): July 24, 2020; Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: July 24, 2020; Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: August 21, 2020; Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: September 11, 2020; Expert Discovery Cutoff: September 18, 2020; Last Day to File Daubert Motions: September 25, 2020; Last Day to File Other Motions in Limine (Excluding Daubert Motions): October 16, 2020; Final Pretrial Conference (10:30 a.m.): November 13, 2020. See document for details. (lom)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: On the Courts own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 10:30 a.m. is ordered VACATED. Scheduling Order will be issued. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 Days, filed by Defendant LKQ Corporation.. (Attia, Ashley)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 12/13/2019 at 10:30 a.m. See document for details. (tg)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01968 JLS (KKx). (esa)
October 15, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant LKQ Corporation. (filed in state court 10/15/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 25)(esa)
October 15, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, LKQ Corporation, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Juan Pacheco Lopez. (filed in state court 9/5/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 4) (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant LKQ Corporation's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LKQ Corporation, identifying Plaintiff Juan Pacheco Lopez; Defendant LKQ Corporation; Pick-Your-Part Auto Wrecking. (Attia, Ashley)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LKQ Corporation. (Attia, Ashley)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1926516 Receipt No: 0973-24605550 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant LKQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Attia ISO of Defendant LKQ Corporation's Notice of Removal Removal, #2 Declaration of J. Corral ISO of Defendant LKQ Corporation's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Ashley Nadia Attia added to party LKQ Corporation(pty:dft))(Attia, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juan Pacheco Lopez v. LKQ Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pacheco Lopez
Represented By: Carolina Veronica Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LKQ Corporation
Represented By: Ashley Nadia Attia
Represented By: Lonnie D Giamela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?