Nancy Jimenez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Nancy Jimenez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv01995
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nancy Jimenez, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (sbou)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff #9 by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: granting #9 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Nancy Jimenez as Guardian ad Litem for A.J.J. (sbou)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Nancy Jimenez. (sbou)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION for Appointment of Nancy Jimenez as Guardian ad Litem for A.J.J. filed by Plaintiff Nancy Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (sbou)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Social Security) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (sbou)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SHERI PYM [SOCIAL SECURITY]: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM SIMILAR ORDERS BY OTHER JUDGES: Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint and a copy of this order on defendant in the manner required by Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file a proof of service showing compliance with this paragraph within 30 days of the date of this order. Defendants counsel shall file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the summons and complaint. Defendant shall electronically serve on plaintiff a complete copy of the administrative record within 90 days of the service of the complaint (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order Directing Plaintiffs Representative to Seek Permission to Serve as Guardian Ad Litem. Accordingly, the court orders that on or before November 6, 2019 (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (kca)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Nancy Jimenez. (car)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nancy Jimenez (car)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, filed by Plaintiff Nancy Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nancy Jimenez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?