Norman Cady v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Norman Cady
Defendant: Does 1 to 25, inclusive and Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv02047
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Bitterlin, Dane)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
October 25, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does 1 to 25, filed by Plaintiff Norman Cady. (FILED IN Riverside COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/20/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-02047 AB (SHKx). (lh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, (Bitterlin, Dane)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Bitterlin, Dane)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number PSC1906747 Receipt No: 0973-24670089 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Declaration of Service) (Attorney Dane Joseph Bitterlin added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft))(Bitterlin, Dane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman Cady v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Hugh A McCabe
Represented By: Dane Joseph Bitterlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Cady
Represented By: Andrew L Treger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?