Bobby Watkins v. Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bobby Watkins
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., Amazon.com, Inc. and DOES 1 to 25, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv02091
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., Judge Jesus G. Bernal's Standing Order served on November 19, 2019. (Davis, Benjamin)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed in State Court served on 11/01/19. (Davis, Benjamin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
October 31, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. in San Bernardino Superior Court on 10/21/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
October 31, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Bobby Watkins in San Bernardino Superior Court on 7/25/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., identifying Bobby Watkins, Plaintiff; Amazon.Com Services, Inc., Defendant. (Deniston, Martin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (Deniston, Martin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Supeior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1921340 Receipt No: 0973-24708185 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Martin K Deniston added to party AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.(pty:dft))(Deniston, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobby Watkins v. Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Watkins
Represented By: Matthew M Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Martin K Deniston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Martin K Deniston
Represented By: Benjamin A. Davis
Represented By: Craig C Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?