Robert S. Whitmore v. The Cornerstone Bank
Plaintiff: Robert S Whitmore
Defendant: The Cornerstone Bank and Cornerstone Bank
Not Yet Classified: Dorothy Lee Bitter
Case Number: 5:2019cv02144
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Missouri #18 filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. (Burch, Carleton)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Missouri #18 (18-2 Declaration of Jim Armstrong) filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. (Burch, Carleton)
December 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Missouri filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carleton Burch, #2 Declaration of Jim Armstrong, #3 Request for Judicial Notice) (Burch, Carleton)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT THE CORNERSTONE BANK'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE OF THIS CASE #1 Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court would GRANT the motion to withdraw the reference. The Court sets a status conference for January 23, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. (See minutes for further details)Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (yl)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. Exhibit 1 as to Reply (Motion related) #15 . (Burch, Carleton)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY In Support of Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Burch, Carleton)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Christopher F. Weiss on behalf of Plaintiff Robert S Whitmore. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. On 11/19/18 attorney was granted permission to appear in this case pro hac vice before the Bankruptcy Court and L.Bankr.R.8 authorizes the continuation of that representation in this case before the District Court. (lt)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE with Proof of Service [LINKED TO DOCKET NO. 12] filed by Plaintiff Robert S Whitmore. (Mang, Tinho)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE with Proof of Service [LINKED TO DOCKET NO. 1] filed by Plaintiff Robert S Whitmore. (Mang, Tinho)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. Notice of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw Reference (Burch, Carleton)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher F. Weiss. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion to Withdraw Reference by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 is set for hearing. Hearing regarding Motion to Withdraw Reference (Complaint) set for 12/5/2019 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (esa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter to District Judge George H. Wu. Proposed order forwarded to District Judge. (esa)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to clerical error. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been reassigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. New Case Number 5:19-cv-02144 GW. (esa)
November 6, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant The Cornerstone Bank. (filed in USBC CDCA Riverside, submitted as document 5, p. 87)(esa)
November 6, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendant The Cornerstone Bank, filed by plaintiff Robert S Whitmore. (filed in USBC CDCA Riverside, submitted as document 5, p. 27) (esa) Modified on 11/7/2019 (esa).
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. (Burch, Carleton)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Carleton R. Burch re Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. (Burch, Carleton)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank, (Burch, Carleton)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. (Burch, Carleton)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding No. 6:19-ap-01124-SY to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Case No. 6:18-BK-18322-SY Receipt No: 0973-24736475 - Fee: $181, filed by Defendant The Cornerstone Bank. (Attorney Carleton R Burch added to party The Cornerstone Bank(pty:dft))(Burch, Carleton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert S. Whitmore v. The Cornerstone Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cornerstone Bank
Represented By: Carleton R Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Bank
Represented By: Carleton R Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S Whitmore
Represented By: Chad V Haes
Represented By: D Edward Hays
Represented By: Tinho Mang
Represented By: Christopher F Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Dorothy Lee Bitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?