Katrina Harris v. 68-444 Perez, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Katrina Harris
Defendant: Does 4-100, 68-444 Perez, Inc. dba Showgirls, Doe Managers 1-3, Abdul Wahab Shawkat, 68-444 Perez, Inc. and Does 4-100, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv02184
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #12 . IT IS HEREBY ordered that defendants' time to respond to the Complaint, and the time for the parties to engage in their Rule 26 meeting, be, and hereby is, extended to 1/17/2020. ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/17/2020.) (twdb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:19-cv-02184 JGB(SPx). (rn)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant 68-444 Perez, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Steven J Shapero added to party 68-444 Perez, Inc.(pty:dft))(Shapero, Steven)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 68-444 Perez, Inc. answer now due 1/5/2020; Abdul Wahab Shawkat answer now due 1/5/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Katrina Harris.(Kristensen, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Katrina Harris, upon Defendant Abdul Wahab Shawkat served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Abdul Wahab Shawkat in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kristensen, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Katrina Harris, upon Defendant 68-444 Perez, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 68-444 Perez, Inc. dba Showgirls in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kristensen, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Abdul Wahab Shawkat. (et)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 68-444 Perez, Inc. (et)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV11C- Statement of Consent) (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Katrina Harris. (Kristensen, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Katrina Harris. (Kristensen, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Katrina Harris, (Kristensen, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Katrina Harris. (Kristensen, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24776728 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Katrina Harris. (Attorney John P Kristensen added to party Katrina Harris(pty:pla))(Kristensen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katrina Harris v. 68-444 Perez, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 68-444 Perez, Inc. dba Showgirls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Managers 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Wahab Shawkat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 68-444 Perez, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Harris
Represented By: John P Kristensen
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Ventura
Represented By: Jesenia Anahy Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?