Elizabeth Nance v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A, Nance
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv02248
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-2248 ADS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Haley, Denise)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth A, Nance, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 12/10/2019, answer due 4/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haley, Denise)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (kh)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (kh)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (kh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth A, Nance, (Haley, Denise)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth A, Nance. (Haley, Denise)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth A, Nance. (Haley, Denise)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth A, Nance. (Haley, Denise)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth A, Nance. (Attorney Denise Bourgeois Haley added to party Elizabeth A, Nance (pty:pla))(Haley, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizabeth Nance v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jean M Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A, Nance
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?