Singh Gurwinder v. David W. Jennings et al
Petitioner: Singh Gurwinder
Respondent: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility, Kirstjen M. Nielson, Ronald D. Vitiello, Jeff Sessions and David W. Jennings
Case Number: 5:2019cv02348
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PETITIONER Singh Gurwinder. Dismissal is without. (Ghazialam, Bashir)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bashir Ghazialam counsel for Petitioner Singh Gurwinder. Adding BASHIR GHAZIALAM as counsel of record for SINGH GURWINDER for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PETITIONER SINGH GURWINDER. (Attorney Bashir Ghazialam added to party Singh Gurwinder(pty:pet))(Ghazialam, Bashir)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Why Petition Should Not Be Dismissed as Moot by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Petitioner must file his response to this Order to Show Cause no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. (See document for details.) (sbou)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR OF INCORRECT PAGES Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) #1 , MOTION for Appointment of Counsel #2 . See CLERK'S CORRECTIONS, documents #6 and #7. (esa)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S CORRECTIONS re MOTION filed by Petitioner Singh Gurwinder, correcting MOTION for Appointment of Counsel #2 (esa)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S CORRECTIONS re PETITION filed by Petitioner Singh Gurwinder, correcting Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 (esa)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill S Casselman counsel for Respondents David W. Jennings, Kirstjen M. Nielson, Jeff Sessions, Ronald D. Vitiello, Warden of Immigration Detention Facility. Adding Jill S. Casselman as counsel of record for David W. Jennigs, Ronald D. Vitiello, Kristjen M. Nielsen, Jeff Sessions, and Warden of Immigration Detention Facility for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondents David W. Jennings, Ronald D. Vitiello, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jeff Sessions; and Warden Of Immigration Detention Facility. (Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party David W. Jennings(pty:res), Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party Kirstjen M. Nielson(pty:res), Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party Jeff Sessions(pty:res), Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party Ronald D. Vitiello(pty:res), Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party Warden of Immigration Detention Facility(pty:res))(Casselman, Jill)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION AND DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: that Respondents file Answer to the Petition not later than 1/27/2020. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 1/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (sbou)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by petitioner Singh Gurwinder. (esa)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, (Filing fee due), filed by petitioner Singh Gurwinder. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh Gurwinder v. David W. Jennings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jill S Casselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielson
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jill S Casselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jill S Casselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Sessions
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jill S Casselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David W. Jennings
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jill S Casselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Singh Gurwinder
Represented By: Bashir Ghazialam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?