Brian Rhodes v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Brian Rhodes
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv02381
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-2381 DFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Brian Rhodes. (Kuntz, William)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Rhodes, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 12/30/2019, answer due 4/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. DeLaRosa, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to unknown signer, unknown title,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to B. Saltory, Unknown Title, on behalf of General Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint documents. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order Re Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (nbo)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (nbo)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting #3 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (nbo)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Rhodes. (Kuntz, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Rhodes, identifying Unitied States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Brian Rhodes. (Kuntz, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Brian Rhodes. (Kuntz, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Brian Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Brian Rhodes(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Rhodes v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Rhodes
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?