Western States Trucking Association v. Xavier Becerra, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Western States Trucking Association
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Does 1-10
Intervenor Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Case Number: 5:2019cv02447
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor-Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Bradley Raymond in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Intervene) (Leyton, Stacey)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Edward Kushner counsel for Intervenor Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Adding Andrew E. Kushner as counsel of record for International Brotherhood of Teamsters for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor-Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attorney Andrew Edward Kushner added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters(pty:intvd))(Kushner, Andrew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacey M Leyton counsel for Intervenor Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Adding Stacey M. Leyton as counsel of record for International Brotherhood of Teamsters for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor-Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters(pty:intvd))(Leyton, Stacey)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder:Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten (10) Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby DISMISSES Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive (lc)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or Less). Other error(s) with document(s): Case number missing division and assigned Magistrate. Correct case number is to read as: 5:19cv02447 CAS (KKx). Re incorrect event used...no Extension of time was recorded on case docket. The cited correct event would have done so. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Filer failed to include Court division on official case number. Correct case number is to read as: 5:19cv02447 CAS (KKx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond to initial complaint by not more than 30 days filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra.(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda on behalf of Defendant Xavier Becerra (Attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft))(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association, upon Defendant Xavier Becerra served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon A. Barnes, Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Whalen, Patrick)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Xavier Becerra. (esa)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association. (Whalen, Patrick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Western States Trucking Association. (Whalen, Patrick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24986956 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association. (Attorney Patrick James Whalen added to party Western States Trucking Association(pty:bkmov))(Whalen, Patrick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24986956 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Western States Trucking Association. (Attorney Patrick James Whalen added to party Western States Trucking Association(pty:bkmov))(Whalen, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western States Trucking Association v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western States Trucking Association
Represented By: Patrick James Whalen
Represented By: Kirk Lonon Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Andrew Edward Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?