Renee Sowell v. Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Renee Sowell
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, Inclusive and FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00061
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #15 filed by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Brick, Ashley)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
February 27, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Renee Sowell in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #15 filed by Plaintiff Renee Sowell. (Slaughter, Yolanda)
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #15 filed by Plaintiff Renee Sowell. (Slaughter, Yolanda)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Separatley Bound Documentary Evidence ISO MTC, #3 Proposed Order) (Brick, Ashley)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Yolanda A. Slaughter Re: Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Renee Sowell. (Slaughter, Yolanda)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Renee Sowell, identifying Renee Sowell. (Slaughter, Yolanda)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #10 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #9 Initial Standing Order served on 01/13/2020. (Brick, Ashley)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-00061 FMO (KKx). (jtil)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Kenly Kiya Kato. New Case Number 5:20-cv-00061 FMO (KKx). (jtil)
January 8, 2020 CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. in San Bernardino Superior Court on 1/6/2020, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil)
January 8, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Renee Sowell in San Bernardino Superior Court on 10/15/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, re Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 01/08/2020. (Brick, Ashley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, identifying Plaintiff Renee Sowell; Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Brick, Ashley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation identifying FedEx Supply Chain Holdings, Inc.; FedEx Supply Chain Holdings, Inc. is wholly-owned by FedEx Supply Chain Distribution System, Inc.; FedEx Supply Chain Distribution System, Inc. is wholly-owned by FedEx Logistics, Inc.; and FedEx Logistics, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of FedEx Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Brick, Ashley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Brick, Ashley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Brick, Ashley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1930799 Receipt No: 0973-25081237 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Brick ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #6 Declaration of Constance McGregor ISO Removal) (Attorney Ashley Jane Brick added to party Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation(pty:dft))(Brick, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renee Sowell v. Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Sowell
Represented By: Yolanda A Slaughter
Represented By: Rodney Mesriani
Represented By: Brandon Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Represented By: Brandie N Charles
Represented By: Ashley Jane Brick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?