Maher Roman v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Maher Roman
Defendant: The United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 5:2020cv00157
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant The United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (gk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 1/22/2020, receipt number 097325168718), filed by plaintiff Maher Roman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Interested Parties)(Swanson, Sara)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25168718 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Maher Roman, MD. (Attorney Robert Garcia, Jr added to party Maher Roman, MD(pty:pla))(Garcia, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maher Roman v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maher Roman
Represented By: Sarah K Simon
Represented By: Robert Garcia, Jr
Represented By: Sara A Swanson
Represented By: Jeffrey C McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?