Bryan Estrada v. MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Estrada
Defendant: MHC 13 (Hemet CA) LLC, CubeSmart Self Storage, Does 1-10, inclusive and MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00323
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants CubeSmart Self Storage, MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC. (Arevalo, Eric)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff Bryan Estrada and Defendants MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC and CubeSmart Self Storage by and through their respective counsel of record #15 , having stipulated that Defendants shall have until April 16, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED. (lc) Modified on 3/24/2020 (lc).
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: CubeSmart Self Storage, MHC 13 Hemet CA LLCStipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or Less); or if appropriate: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or MORE), which requires a proposed order. Other error(s) with document(s): The incorrect event used does NOT provide the extension sought. Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Defendants CubeSmart Self Storage, MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC.(Attorney Eric Arevalo added to party CubeSmart Self Storage(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Arevalo added to party MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC(pty:dft))(Arevalo, Eric)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than March 23, 2020 why this action shouldnot be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date:Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendants. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence.Answer by the defendant(s). No oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 WITHDRAWAL of, Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada. (Cornell, Ross)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than March 27, 2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lc)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada, upon Defendant MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon MHC HEMET 13, LLC by Becky DeGeorge, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada, upon Defendant CubeSmart Self Storage served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CubeSmart Self Storage by Denise Donnelly in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants CubeSmart Self Storage, MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC. (ghap)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bryan Estrada. (Cornell, Ross)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada, (Cornell, Ross)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada. (Cornell, Ross)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25394070 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Bryan Estrada. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Bryan Estrada(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan Estrada v. MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Estrada
Represented By: Ross Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHC 13 (Hemet CA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CubeSmart Self Storage
Represented By: Eric Arevalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHC 13 Hemet CA LLC
Represented By: Eric Arevalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?