An Thanh Nguyen v. David A. Marin et al
Petitioner: An Thanh Nguyen
Respondent: David A. Marin, Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv00646
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SEALED ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. (yl)
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 First STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Amend)(Ramsy, Monica)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STAY ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: It is Ordered that, pursuant to the Preliminary Injunction issued in Roman, Petitioner shall remain released pending a final resolution of Roman or further order of the Court. It is further Ordered that pending a final resolution of Roman, this case be, and hereby is, Stayed. (shb)
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen, upon Respondents Matthew T. Albence served on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; James Janecka served on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; David A. Marin served on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to U.S. Attorney's Office. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Zhao, Jingni)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that the Court issued a temporary restraining order [TRO] in this case on April 3, 2020, and ordered Respondents to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2), the TRO will expire on April 17, 2020, the fourteenth day after the date of issuance, unless, for good cause, the Court extends it. The parties have filed their respective briefs in response to the Courts Order to Show Cause: re: Preliminary Injunction. The Court finds that good cause exists under Rule 65(b)(2)to extend the TRO for an additional 14 days. The good cause is that the extension will allow the Court time to consider the significant constitutional issues raised in the parties briefs. The TRO will remain in effect until May 1, 2020. (shb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY In support of Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of An Thanh Nguyen, #2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jingni Zhao with Exhibits)(Zhao, Jingni)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Respondents Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka, David A. Marin, Chad F. Wolfto Order,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,,,, #10 (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Gabriel Valdez, #2 Proposed Order)(Biche, Timothy)
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 as to Defendants Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka, David A. Marin, Chad F. Wolf. (shb)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: It is Ordered that the application for a temporary restraining order be, and hereby is, Granted. It is further Ordered that Respondents shall, by 5:00 p.m. on April 4, 2020, release Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen from custody pending further order of this Court, and subject to the following conditions of release: 1. Petitioner shall reside, and shelter in place, at the residence of JenniferNguyen; 2. Petitioner shall be transported from the Adelanto Detention Center directly to the Residence by Vivian Nguyen; 3. Petitioner shall not leave the Residence, pending further order of the Court, except to obtain medical care;4. Petitioner shall not violate any federal, state or local laws; 5. Petitioner shall not use or possess alcohol or illegal drugs; and 6. At the discretion of DHS and/or BICE, to enforce the above restrictions, Petitioners whereabouts may be monitored by telephonic and/or electronic and/or GPS monitoring and/or a location verification system and/or an automated identification system. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents shall show cause, if they have any, as to why the court should not issue a preliminary injunction in this case. Respondents' response, if any, to this order to show cause shall be filed by Noon on April 10, 2020. Petitioner's reply, if any, to Respondents' response shall be filed by Noon on April 15, 2020. The matter will then stand submitted. (shb)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY in Support of Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Petitioner's Immediate Release #5 filed by Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Robert B. Greifinger)(Zhao, Jingni)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 OPPOSITION re: Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Petitioner's Immediate Release #5 filed by Respondents Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka, David A. Marin, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gabriel Valdez, #2 Declaration of Timothy D. Biche, #3 Declaration of Michael Jimeno, #4 Objections to Declaration of Jingni Zhao, #5 Proposed Order)(Attorney Timothy Daniel Biche added to party Matthew T. Albence(pty:res), Attorney Timothy Daniel Biche added to party James Janecka(pty:res), Attorney Timothy Daniel Biche added to party David A. Marin(pty:res), Attorney Timothy Daniel Biche added to party Chad F. Wolf(pty:res))(Biche, Timothy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall immediately. Respondents are to file their opposition to the Temporary Restraining Order by no later than5pm on April 1, 2020. (shb)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 filed by Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen. (Zhao, Jingni)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Petitioner's Immediate Release filed by Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jingni Zhao, #2 Exhibit A-M to Zhao Declaration, #3 Declaration of Vivian Nguyen, #4 Proposed Order Granting TRO, #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause) (Zhao, Jingni)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (lh)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen. Related Case(s): 5:20-cv-00590; 5:20-cv-00605; 5:20-cv-00617; 5:20-cv-00625; 5:20-cv-00626; 5:20-cv-00627 (Zhao, Jingni)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen. (Zhao, Jingni)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. ACACDC-25919019 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner An Thanh Nguyen. (Attorney Jingni Zhao added to party An Thanh Nguyen(pty:pet))(Zhao, Jingni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: An Thanh Nguyen v. David A. Marin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David A. Marin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy Daniel Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy Daniel Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Janecka
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy Daniel Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy Daniel Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: An Thanh Nguyen
Represented By: Jingni Zhao
Represented By: Anoop Prasad
Represented By: Monica Ramsy
Represented By: Monica George Ramsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?