Gary S. Hann v. Royal Palms Mobile Home Park et al
Plaintiff: Gary S. Hann
Defendant: Jarrod Vincent Whitehorn, Asset Access Management, Inc., Christine Gallaway, Samuel Lawrence Silverman, Sun Communities, Inc., Royal Palms Mobile Home Park, Brian Tosti, Maple Ridge Mobile Homes of California, Inc., Aadesh Sachdeva, Diana Denise Borghi, Adam Joseph Clarke and Sandra Breen
Case Number: 5:2020cv00805
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Robyn Sherain Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Christine Gallaway, Royal Palms Mobile Home Park, Brian Tosti #10 filed by Defendant Royal Palms Mobile Home Park. (Dahlin, C)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Royal Palms Mobile Home Park. (Attorney C William Dahlin added to party Royal Palms Mobile Home Park(pty:dft))(Dahlin, C)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Christine Gallaway, Royal Palms Mobile Home Park, Brian Tosti #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Application for Default has been entered by the Clerk. However, there was a Proposed Order for Default Judgment submitted. There is no Application for Default Judgment An application for Default Judgment must be filed with the court and a proposed order In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Royal Palms Mobile Home Park, Christine Gallaway, Brian Tosti (shb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Christine Gallaway, Royal Palms Mobile Home Park, Brian Tosti filed by Plaintiff Gary S. Hann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed default judgment) (shb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary S. Hann, upon Defendant Brian Tosti served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lea Foster, Agent for Royal Palms Mobile Home Park in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (shb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal Palms Mobile Home Park, upon Defendant Maple Ridge Mobile Homes of California, Inc. served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lea Foster, Agent for Royal Palms Mobile Home Park in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (shb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary S. Hann, upon Defendant Christine Gallaway served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lea Foster, Agent for Royal Palms Mobile Home Park in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (shb)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Asset Access Management, Inc., Diana Denise Borghi, Sandra Breen, Adam Joseph Clarke, Christine Gallaway, Maple Ridge Mobile Homes of California, Inc., Royal Palms Mobile Home Park, Aadesh Sachdeva, Samuel Lawrence Silverman, Sun Communities, Inc., Brian Tosti, Jarrod Vincent Whitehorn. (car)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gary S. Hann, (car)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani.(Filing fee $ 400 FEE PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Gary S. Hann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary S. Hann v. Royal Palms Mobile Home Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary S. Hann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Vincent Whitehorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Access Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Gallaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Lawrence Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Communities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Palms Mobile Home Park
Represented By: C William Dahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Tosti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maple Ridge Mobile Homes of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aadesh Sachdeva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Denise Borghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Joseph Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?