Paul Duran v. O Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paul Duran
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive and O Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Petitioner: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00864
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on June 12, 2020. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT RULE 26 REPORT OF THE PARTIES REPORT of Rule 26 Report filed by Defendant O Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Peterson, James)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/29/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dolly M. Gee. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-00864 DMG (KKx). (ghap)
April 22, 2020 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant O Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
April 22, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, O Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Paul Duran. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/11/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Paradis, Derek)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, identifying O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., a publicly held corporation; O'Reilly Auto Parts. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Paradis, Derek)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Paradis, Derek)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC2001110 Receipt No: ACACDC-26181814 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek W. Paradis in Support of Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Mark Merz in Support of Notice of Removal of Action, #5 Proof of Service) (Attorney Derek W Paradis added to party O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Paradis, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Duran v. O Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Duran
Represented By: Timothy Michael Cojocnean
Represented By: Corey Alexander Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Derek W Paradis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: James M Peterson
Represented By: Derek W Paradis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?