In re Clifford Allen Brace, Jr.
Appellee: Mohd H. Habeeburrehman, Catamount Properties 2018, LLC and Steven M Speier
Appellant: Clifford Allen Brace, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01048
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT(S) DESIGNATED FOR AN APPEAL filed by appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Transcript)(mrgo)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 OPPOSITION TO OSC filed by appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. Re: Order to Show Cause, #12 . (mrgo)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: BANKRUPTCY APPEAL by Judge Percy Anderson: Appellant is ordered to show cause, in writing, on or before 7/8/2020 why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to respond to this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal. (See document for further details). (jp)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE regarding Notice of Transcript, Transcript(s) forwarded to Judge Percy Anderson. (bm)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF ISSUES ON APPEAL filed by Appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr (et)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND NOTICE OF RELATED CASES filed by debtor Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. (yl)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF RECORD filed by Appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. (et)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (esa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 U.S. Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Ninth Circuit Notice of Transfer of Appeal to District Court. Receipt acknowledged 5/18/20 by U.S. District Court. (esa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL to BAP 9th Circuit prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 5/11/20. (esa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION filed by Appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. (esa)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION Re: ORDER adjudicating Debtor, Clifford Allen Brace, Jr., in civil contempt for willful violation of the automatic stay by conducting unlqawful foreclosre sale of estate property entered on 5/5/20 by Bankruptcy Judge Scott H. Yun, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 5/8/20. Bankruptcy Court case number: 6:11-bk-26154 SY, Adversary number: NA, BAP case number: cc-20-1112., filed by appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. (Attachments: #1 BAP Dkt) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Clifford Allen Brace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mohd H. Habeeburrehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC
Represented By: Seth Philip Cox
Represented By: David M Poitras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steven M Speier
Represented By: Judith Marshack
Represented By: D Edward Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clifford Allen Brace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?