Jaime R. Sandoval v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Jaime R. Sandoval
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv01053
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Service (subsequent documents) #11 by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The document is accepted as filed, but not as a Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file a Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint in accordance with Local Rule 5-3.1.2. Service must be made in accordance with F.R.Civ.P. 5. (dml)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Service #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. The Notice of Service does not indicate what document(s) was served, when the document(s) was served, or to whom the document(s) was served. 2. There is not an attached receipt re: Certified Mail. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr) (Attachment(s): #1 Notice of Service) (hr).
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Jaime R. Sandoval [Unclear as to what documents were served and to whom. Discrepancy to issue.] (dml)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. See Order for details. (dml)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Social Security), #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (dml)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (dml)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred to District of Central District of California, Eastern Division.. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Eastern Division.*.*3470 Twelfth Street**Riverside, CA 92501-3801*. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 5/15/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: #1 Transfer Order) (mme). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Jaime R. Sandoval. (smd) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Michael S. Berg has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmr) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jaime R. Sandoval. (jmr) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.] Modified on 5/19/2020 (ghap). Modified on 5/19/2020 (ghap). Modified on 5/19/2020 (ghap).
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, IFP Filed, filed by Jaime R. Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-789-MSB. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is assigned to the case.(jmr)(jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaime R. Sandoval v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime R. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?