Jasper Crook v. Robin Shea
Plaintiff: Jasper Crook
Defendant: Robin Shea
Case Number: 5:2020cv01154
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 20 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Robin Shea. (mrgo)
July 16, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Robin Shea filed by plaintiff Jasper Crook. (mrgo)
July 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Robin Shea #17 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: A Notice of deficiency was filed #13. The proof of service acknowledgment of service was not signed by the party acknowledging service. There is no receipt attached regarding the certified mail nos. Clerk is unable to determine whether or not this service is sufficient. Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. (twdb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Robin Shea filed by plaintiff Jasper Crook. (twdb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Robin Shea #14 filed by Plaintiff Jasper Crook. (twdb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jasper Crook in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Robin Shea #14 filed by Plaintiff Jasper Crook. (twdb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Robin Shea filed by plaintiff Jasper Crook. Motion set for hearing on 8/10/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (twdb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Robin Shea #12 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The proof of service - acknowledgment of service was not signed by the party acknowledging service. There is no receipt attached regarding the certified mail nos. Clerk is unable to determine whether or not this service is sufficient. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (twdb)
July 9, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Robin Shea filed by plaintiff Jasper Crook. (twdb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service filed by plaintiff Jasper Crook, served on 7/1/20. (twdb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service filed by plaintiff Jasper Crook, re Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #9 served on 7/1/20. (twdb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service filed by plaintiff Jasper Crook, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges #5 served on 7/1/20. (twdb)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE - Acknowledgment of Service Executed by Plaintiff Jasper Crook, upon Defendant Robin Shea served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shea Robin (by cert mail) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Robin Shea. (jtil)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Jasper Crook, served on 5/28/2020. (jtil)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jasper Crook. (jtil)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiff Jasper Crook against Defendant Robin Shea. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Filing fee $ 400 Paid). (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jasper Crook v. Robin Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?