Catherine Sandberg v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Catherine Sandberg
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv01250
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV20-1250 AFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Catherine Sandberg. (Rosales, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Catherine Sandberg, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 7/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (es)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. *See order.* (es)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITYAPPEAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: *See order for details.* (es)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: GRANTING #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (es)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Catherine Sandberg, (Rosales, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Catherine Sandberg. (Rosales, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed as CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Catherine Sandberg. (Rosales, Steven) Modified on 6/23/2020 (lh).
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Catherine Sandberg. (Rosales, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Catherine Sandberg. (Rosales, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Catherine Sandberg. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Catherine Sandberg(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catherine Sandberg v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Sandberg
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?